MN HF2672 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Injured or orphaned wolves special rehabilitation permits provided.
Title
Injured or orphaned wolves special rehabilitation permits provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-05-18 | House | Author added Omar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2396 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Author added Abeler