MN HF2624 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental and natural resources funding provided, approval required for acquisition of certain lands to be conveyed to the state, and money appropriated.
Title
Environmental and natural resources funding provided, approval required for acquisition of certain lands to be conveyed to the state, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-14 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-12 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-12 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-12 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-12 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-12 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: House adopted HCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-04 | House: Senate conferees Anderson, Frederickson, Vickerman | |
2010-05-04 | House: Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2010-05-03 | Senate: Senate conferees Anderson; Frederickson; Vickerman | |
2010-05-03 | Senate: House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-05-03 | Senate: Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed | |
2010-05-03 | Senate: House conferees Wagenius; Rukavina; Howes | |
2010-04-28 | House: House conferees Wagenius, Rukavina, Howes | |
2010-04-21 | House: House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-04-21 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-04-15 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: Referred to Finance | |
2010-03-15 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-03-15 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-03-15 | House: Amended | |
2010-03-15 | House: Point of order raised, ruled well taken | |
2010-03-15 | House: Amendments offered | |
2010-03-11 | House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar 03/15/10 | |
2010-02-25 | House: Author added Brynaert | |
2010-02-22 | House: Second reading | |
2010-02-22 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2010-02-16 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2010-02-11 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-02-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2010-02-04 | House: Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |