MN HF2566 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 206 05/09/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 206 05/09/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
St. Paul Port Authority; meetings by telephone or other electronic means authorized.
Title
St. Paul Port Authority; meetings by telephone or other electronic means authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 111 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 206 05/09/14 | |
2014-05-09 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-09 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-09 | Governor approval | |
2014-05-06 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-05 | House | Returned from Senate |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 56-0 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2166 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2166, now on General Orders |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-30 | House | Bill was passed vote: 111-14 |
2014-04-30 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-28 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 30, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |