MN HF2516 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Election administration related provisions modified; and technical changes made to voting, voter registration, ballots, and other election-related provisions.
Title
Election administration related provisions modified; and technical changes made to voting, voter registration, ballots, and other election-related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-25 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2390 |
2014-03-10 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections |