MN HF2511 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; immunization status vaccine passport requirement prohibited.
Title
COVID-19; immunization status vaccine passport requirement prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] | Rep. Steve Sandell [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Robbins |
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Akland |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-04-15 | House | Authors added Dettmer and Lueck |
2021-04-13 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-04-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2430 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Authors added Coleman; Jasinski