MN HF250 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual assault; affirmative consent instruction in schools required, and money appropriated.
Title
Sexual assault; affirmative consent instruction in schools required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Bierman |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance Division |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Jordan as chief author |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Wazlawik |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF188 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Author added Wiklund