MN HF2366 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author stricken Davids
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic game definitions clarified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic game definitions clarified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseAuthor stricken Davids
2021-04-15HouseAuthor stricken Backer
2021-04-15HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-04-09HouseAuthor added Haley
2021-03-25HouseAuthor added Backer
2021-03-23HouseAuthor added Davids
2021-03-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1863 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback