MN HF2359 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Dodge County; retention election required for persons appointed to county offices, and process provided to make the county recorder appointive.
Title
Dodge County; retention election required for persons appointed to county offices, and process provided to make the county recorder appointive.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Quam [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2012-04-04 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-04-03 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1880 |
2012-03-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |