MN HF2328 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota Zoo funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota Zoo funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-12HouseReferred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
2019-03-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2395 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Capital Investment

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback