MN HF2252 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nonemergency Medical Transportation Advisory Committee membership modified.
Title
Nonemergency Medical Transportation Advisory Committee membership modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-10 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2089 |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2089 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed