MN HF2249 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cosmetology; salon and salon manager regulation requirements repealed for licensed practitioners who only provide eyelash extensions.
Title
Cosmetology; salon and salon manager regulation requirements repealed for licensed practitioners who only provide eyelash extensions.
Sponsors
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Munson |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF696 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Author added Westrom