MN HF2246 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conversion therapy with children or vulnerable adults prohibited, and medical assistance coverage for conversion therapy prohibited.
Title
Conversion therapy with children or vulnerable adults prohibited, and medical assistance coverage for conversion therapy prohibited.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2017-03-09 | House | Author added Clark. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1854 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Author added Dziedzic