MN HF2172 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Authors added Albright and Lippert
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Authors added Albright and Lippert
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School bus stop-signal arm violations established and portion of fines collected distributed to school districts.
Title
School bus stop-signal arm violations established and portion of fines collected distributed to school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Authors added Albright and Lippert |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF584 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy