MN HF2150 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Telemedicine evaluations allowed to be used for erectile dysfunction medication prescribing.
Title
Telemedicine evaluations allowed to be used for erectile dysfunction medication prescribing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-04-28 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2184 |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2184 (Similar To) 2020-04-28 - Second reading