MN HF2144 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Open season for taking wolves prohibited, and criminal penalties increased.
Title
Open season for taking wolves prohibited, and criminal penalties increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-03-02 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Feist |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2062 (Similar To) 2023-02-27 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy