MN HF2058 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Whelan.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Whelan.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Procedural exceptions for light rail or bus rapid transit line construction or expansion eliminated, and appraisal fees modified.
Title
Procedural exceptions for light rail or bus rapid transit line construction or expansion eliminated, and appraisal fees modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Abigail Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Whelan. |
2017-03-14 | House | Author added Lucero. |
2017-03-13 | House | Authors added Pugh, Petersburg, and Scott. |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1841 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy