MN HF2022 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Authors added Theis and Xiong, J.
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Authors added Theis and Xiong, J.
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Optometrists drug prescription and administration limitations modified, and technical changes made.
Title
Optometrists drug prescription and administration limitations modified, and technical changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Authors added Theis and Xiong, J. |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Schomacker, Vang |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Pryor |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Acomb |
2022-01-31 | House | Authors added Her, Franson, Heintzeman, Rasmusson, Klevorn, and Gruenhagen |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Robbins |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Backer |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1873 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Author added Benson