MN SF1873 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Author added Benson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Author added Benson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Optometrists legend drugs prescribing limitations modifications
Title
Optometrists legend drugs prescribing limitations modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Authors added Draheim; Eaton |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2022 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Authors added Theis and Xiong, J.