MN HF1976 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Terrestrial invasive species research center money appropriated.
Title
Terrestrial invasive species research center money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2014-03-10 | House | Author added Bly |
2014-02-27 | House | Authors added Hansen, McNamar, McNamara, Poppe, Persell, and Kahn |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance |