MN HF1960 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Voting equipment purchase with Help America Vote Act grants deadline extended.
Title
Voting equipment purchase with Help America Vote Act grants deadline extended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-22 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1732 |
2014-03-19 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to re-refer State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections |