MN HF1955 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Predatory offender registration provisions amended, Statewide Emergency Communication Board provisions modified, and wheelchair securement device requirements modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Predatory offender registration provisions amended, Statewide Emergency Communication Board provisions modified, and wheelchair securement device requirements modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Carlson, A.
2019-03-13HouseAuthors added Tabke and Lillie
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Howard
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF2468 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback