MN HF19 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Direct injectable drugs reimbursement provisions under medical assistance modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct injectable drugs reimbursement provisions under medical assistance modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseAuthor added Bierman
2021-03-01HouseAuthor added Munson
2021-02-22HouseAuthor added Kiel
2021-02-15HouseAuthor added Moller
2021-01-21HouseAuthor added Baker
2021-01-19HouseAuthors added Franke and Bahner
2021-01-11HouseAuthor added Koegel
2021-01-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF61 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback