MN HF1790 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human services commissioner required to seek an amendment to the budget methodology for consumer-directed community support.
Title
Human services commissioner required to seek an amendment to the budget methodology for consumer-directed community support.
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Mack [R] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2015-03-26 | House | Author added Newton. |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1517 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance