MN HF1784 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Author added Franke
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Author added Franke
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small business support program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Small business support program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Franke |
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Baker |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2082 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy