MN HF1734 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author added Schoen.
Pending: House Mining and Outdoor Recreation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author added Schoen.
Pending: House Mining and Outdoor Recreation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State park pass issuance conditions for military personnel and disabled veterans without a fee modified.
Title
State park pass issuance conditions for military personnel and disabled veterans without a fee modified.
Sponsors
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] |
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Author added Schoen. |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Mining and Outdoor Recreation Policy |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF805 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Second reading