MN HF1712 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Collaborative community dental hygiene service requirements modified, and requirements established.
Title
Collaborative community dental hygiene service requirements modified, and requirements established.
Sponsors
Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/11/17 | |
2017-05-11 | Governor's action Approval | |
2017-05-11 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2017-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2017-05-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-08 | House | Returned from Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1496 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1496, now on General Orders |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading |
2017-04-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 24, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1496 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1712