MN HF170 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voting instructions and sample ballots required to be printed in languages other than English for designated precincts, and multilingual election judges required in designated precincts.
Title
Voting instructions and sample ballots required to be printed in languages other than English for designated precincts, and multilingual election judges required in designated precincts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. John Thompson [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Thompson |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF816 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Author added Carlson