MN HF167 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sports betting provided for and authorized, licenses established, local restrictions prohibited, sports betting taxation provided, civil and criminal penalties provided, and reports required.
Title
Sports betting provided for and authorized, licenses established, local restrictions prohibited, sports betting taxation provided, civil and criminal penalties provided, and reports required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF371 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy