MN HF167 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental environmental project offers provided in conjunction with enforcement actions against polluters.
Title
Supplemental environmental project offers provided in conjunction with enforcement actions against polluters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-14 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Fischer |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-28 | House | Authors added Dehn, Hornstein, Freiberg, Moran, and Her |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF879 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Author added Wiger