MN HF1654 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement and family members enabled to petition a court to prohibit people from possessing firearms if they pose a significant danger to themselves or others by possessing a firearm, and money appropriated.
Title
Law enforcement and family members enabled to petition a court to prohibit people from possessing firearms if they pose a significant danger to themselves or others by possessing a firearm, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-03-08 | House | Authors added Bierman, Hollins and Feist |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Her, Elkins, Long, Agbaje, Christensen, Davnie, Pryor and Carlson |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Kotyza-Witthuhn, Morrison, Edelson, Hausman and Youakim |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1431 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Dziedzic