MN HF160 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homesteads owned by persons age 65 or older property value increase prohibited.
Title
Homesteads owned by persons age 65 or older property value increase prohibited.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Grossell |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF600 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Taxes