MN HF1577 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Labor and Industry required to study disabled or injured police officer benefit adequacy.
Title
Department of Labor and Industry required to study disabled or injured police officer benefit adequacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Akland and Urdahl |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1547 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Author added Pratt