MN HF1566 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Author added Kozlowski
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Author added Kozlowski
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requirements established for commissioner of health to administer lifeline centers to respond to 988 contacts, 988 prepaid wireless fee and 988 telecommunications fee authorized, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Title
Requirements established for commissioner of health to administer lifeline centers to respond to 988 contacts, 988 prepaid wireless fee and 988 telecommunications fee authorized, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Author added Kozlowski |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Lee, F. |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2023-02-21 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2588 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Author added Boldon