MN HF1566 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Hortman.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Homestead credit state refund and property tax refund for renters schedules modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead credit state refund and property tax refund for renters schedules modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseAuthor added Hortman.
2017-03-20HouseAuthor added Fischer.
2017-03-13HouseAuthors added Hilstrom and Koegel.
2017-02-23HouseReferred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
2017-02-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF1163 (Similar To) 2017-02-20 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback