MN HF153 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Gillman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Gillman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax provisions modified, and unlimited Social Security subtraction allowed.
Title
Individual income tax provisions modified, and unlimited Social Security subtraction allowed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House: H.F. NO. 153 (Y: 64 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Author added Gillman |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Dotseth |
2023-02-27 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2023-02-27 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Bliss |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Torkelson |
2023-01-11 | House | Authors added Robbins; Backer; Anderson, P. H.; Hudella; Bennett; Knudsen; Kresha; and Mekeland |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF29 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders