MN HF1508 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Howe.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Howe.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child care licensing provisions modified, and reports required.
Title
Child care licensing provisions modified, and reports required.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Howe. |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1067 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Second reading