MN HF1508 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement; various provisions modified relating to actuarial assumptions, postretirement adjustment triggers, contribution stabilizers, police and firefighter retirement, Minnesota State Retirement System, Teachers Retirement Association, and Public Employees Retirement Association.
Title
Retirement; various provisions modified relating to actuarial assumptions, postretirement adjustment triggers, contribution stabilizers, police and firefighter retirement, Minnesota State Retirement System, Teachers Retirement Association, and Public Employees Retirement Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1398 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed