MN HF1492 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individuals at least 16 years of age permitted to preregister to vote.
Title
Individuals at least 16 years of age permitted to preregister to vote.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Persell |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF253 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Author added Dibble