MN HF1423 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elk reintroduction funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Elk reintroduction funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Alicia Kozlowski [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Author added Brand |
2023-02-15 | House | Authors added Jordan and Lillie |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1573 (Similar To) 2023-02-27 - Author added McEwen