MN HF1389 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shelter facility appropriation bond issuance authorized.
Title
Shelter facility appropriation bond issuance authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Lillie |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-03-08 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Capital Investment |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1719 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Author added Rest