MN HF1388 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AIDS drug assistance program coverage modified.
Title
AIDS drug assistance program coverage modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1136 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy