MN HF1377 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author added Skraba
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author added Skraba
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local government aid provisions modified, calculation of local government aid modified, appropriation for local government aid increased, appropriation for county program aid increased, and Mahnomen property tax reimbursement program aid modified.
Title
Local government aid provisions modified, calculation of local government aid modified, appropriation for local government aid increased, appropriation for county program aid increased, and Mahnomen property tax reimbursement program aid modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Author added Skraba |
2023-03-24 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Taxes |
2023-03-01 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Tabke |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1828 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Referred to Taxes