MN HF1340 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allied health technician scholarship program established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Allied health technician scholarship program established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-16 | House | Author added Moller |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1288 (Similar To) 2023-03-30 - Author added Nelson