MN HF1340 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Pryor and Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health benefits and other medical benefits parity required, and accountability from commissioners of health and commerce required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health benefits and other medical benefits parity required, and accountability from commissioners of health and commerce required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthors added Pryor and Bierman
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Hassan, Becker-Finn, and Loeffler
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF1229 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback