MN SF1229 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Parity between mental health benefits and other medical benefits requirement; health and commerce commissioners accountability requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parity between mental health benefits and other medical benefits requirement; health and commerce commissioners accountability requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
2019-05-18HouseReceived from Senate
2019-05-17SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-17SenateSpecial Order
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading
2019-04-01SenateComm report: To pass
2019-03-27SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-02-14SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1340 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Authors added Pryor and Bierman

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback