MN HF1340 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher preparation program established, and resident teacher license for qualified nontraditional candidates created.
Title
Teacher preparation program established, and resident teacher license for qualified nontraditional candidates created.
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] | Rep. Mindy Greiling [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Carol McFarlane [R] |
Rep. Kim Norton [D] | Rep. Nora Slawik [D] | Rep. Marsha Swails [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-04-01 | House: Referred by Chair to K-12 Education Finance Division | |
2009-03-30 | House: Author added McFarlane | |
2009-03-24 | House: Author added Greiling | |
2009-03-16 | House: Author added Dittrich | |
2009-03-12 | House: Author added Swails | |
2009-03-09 | House: Author added Slawik | |
2009-03-05 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to K-12 Education Policy and Oversight |