MN HF1338 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farmarmerica grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Farmarmerica grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Luke Frederick [D] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] |
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Author added Lippert |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Petersburg |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Anderson |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2175 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Author added Eken