MN HF1333 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rochester Graham Park Regional Event Center renovation and expansion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Rochester Graham Park Regional Event Center renovation and expansion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1979 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Capital Investment