MN HF1264 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Schomacker
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Population eligible to be served with housing grant funding modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Population eligible to be served with housing grant funding modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Schomacker
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-02-28HouseAuthor added Schultz
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1218 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback