MN HF1245 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 04, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 04, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child and family services, chemical and mental health services, operations, health care, and community supports provisions modified; and technical corrections made.
Title
Child and family services, chemical and mental health services, operations, health care, and community supports provisions modified; and technical corrections made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 04, 2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1291 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Second reading